The last thing children ever want to do is math, let alone multiplication! Here are some tricks when it comes to overcoming the dreaded thought of mental math: multiplication edition.

**Multiplying by 6**

This quick trick is very easy to use. All even numbers that you multiple by 6 will end in the units number.

EXAMPLE:

6 x 2 = 1**2**

6 x 4 = 2**4**

6 x 6 = 3**6**

6 x 8 = 4**8**

6 x 10 = 6**0**

6 x 12 = 7**2**

**Multiplying by 9**

Children sometimes are intimidated when multiplying by large numbers. Multiplying by 9 is easier than you think! All you need are your hands for this trick.

Hold both hands in front of you with your palms facing outward. Whatever you are multiplying by (let’s say 5), bend down that finger. That would be your fifth finger from left to right (left thumb). The fingers to the left of the bent finger are the tens (4) and to the right are the units (5).

Another quick trick with 9: The tens and units *always* add up to 9!

EXAMPLE

3 x 9 = 20 something

9 – 2 = 7

So 3 x 9 = 27

**Multiplying by 10**

Multiplying by 10 has to be the easiest number to multiple by.

All you need to do is multiply the first number with the tens place of the second number and add a 0.

EXAMPLE

4 x 50

4 x 5 = 20 (you just add another 0 to the end of that)

4 x 50 = 20**0**

9 x 50

9 x 5 = 40

9 x 50 = 40**0**

CHALLENGE PROBLEM

40 x 50

40 x 5 = 200

40 x 50 = 200**0**

**Multiplying by 11**

Multiplying by 11 is easier than you think!

When multiplying a 1-digit number by 11, just double the number.

EXAMPLE:

2 x 11 = 22

7 x 11 = 77

When multiplying a 2-digit number, add the two digits that you are multiplying by and place the sum in between.

EXAMPLE:

18 x 11 = 1__8

1 + 8 = 9

18 x 11 = 198

89 x 11 = 8__9

8 + 9 = 17 (don’t forget to carry the 1)

89 x 11 = 979

Don’t forget to leave us a comment and let us know your favorite multiplication trick.

Check out the video below to see more multiplication tricks!